House | 05/13/2015 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 3548 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 2107 | |
House | 04/29/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2107 | |
House | 04/28/2015 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Filed |