E | 06/18/2015 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/18/2015 | Filed without the Governor's signature | Journal Page: 6050 | |
E | 05/30/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6025 | |
Senate | 05/30/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3504 | |
House | 05/29/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5564 | |
House | 05/28/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5571 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4978 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2437 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2437 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2437 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2437 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2437 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2437 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2437 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2404 | |
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2155 | |
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 2023 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2023 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1963 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4344 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4115 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Record vote | RV#1293 | Journal Page: 4115 |
House | 05/22/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 4115 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4115 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 4094 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4094 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/17/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/15/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3787 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3225 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 2806 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2806 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Filed |