Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB441 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/14/2015

                    By: Gonzales (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 441
 (In the Senate - Received from the House March 30, 2015;
 April 27, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 14, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 14, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of a court order as an occupational license.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 521.249(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The court shall send a certified copy of the petition
 and the court order setting out the judge's findings and
 restrictions to the department. The person may use a copy of the
 order as a restricted license until the 45th [31st] day after the
 date on which the order takes effect.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *