Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB445 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/15/2015

                    By: Raney, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 445
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs and Military Installations; May 15, 2015, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 15, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to providing notice of the availability of paid leave for
 military service to public officers and employees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 437.202, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (e) and (f) to read as follows:
 (e)  This state, a municipality, a county, or another
 political subdivision of this state shall provide written notice of
 the number of workdays of paid leave to which an officer or employee
 described by Subsection (a) is entitled each fiscal year under
 Subsection (a) and, if applicable, the number of workdays of paid
 leave to which an officer or employee described by Subsection (a) is
 entitled to carry forward each fiscal year under Subsection (b):
 (1)  on employment, in the case of an employee; or
 (2)  as soon as practicable after appointment or
 election, in the case of an officer.
 (f)  This state, a municipality, a county, or another
 political subdivision of this state shall, on the request of an
 officer or employee described by Subsection (a), provide to that
 officer or employee a statement that contains:
 (1)  the number of workdays for which the officer or
 employee claimed paid leave under Subsection (a) in that fiscal
 year; and
 (2)  if the statement is provided to an officer or
 employee of this state:
 (A)  the net balance of unused accumulated leave
 under Subsection (a) for that fiscal year that the officer or
 employee is entitled to carry forward to the next fiscal year; and
 (B)  the net balance of all unused accumulated
 leave under this section to which the officer or employee is
 entitled.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *