Senate | 05/26/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 2026 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1896 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1575 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1575 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1508 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3267 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3000 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Record vote | RV#869 | Journal Page: 2999 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2999 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2999 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2963 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2963 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2559 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/11/2015 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 281 | |
House | 02/11/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 281 | |
House | 12/04/2014 | Filed |