House | 04/22/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/11/2015 | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues | Journal Page: 282 | |
House | 02/11/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 282 | |
House | 12/04/2014 | Filed |