House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/10/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1530 | |
House | 03/31/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/03/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/03/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/03/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/03/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/12/2015 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 300 | |
House | 02/12/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 300 | |
House | 12/08/2014 | Filed |