E
|
06/01/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
E
|
05/22/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4344
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1897
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4214
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4218
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4083
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1760
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1760
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1760
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1760
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1759
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1759
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1759
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 1734
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1585
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1335
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1335
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1253
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2343
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2166
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#464
|
Journal Page: 2165
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2165
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2165
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2102
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Giddings
|
Journal Page: 2101
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2101
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1340
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2015
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 300
|
House
|
02/12/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 300
|
House
|
12/08/2014
|
Filed
|
|
|