Senate | 05/11/2015 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1499 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1499 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1308 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2560 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2369 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Record vote | RV#543 | Journal Page: 2368 |
House | 05/04/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2368 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2368 | |
House | 05/02/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2315 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2315 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Record vote | RV#490 | Journal Page: 2245 |
House | 04/30/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2245 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1944 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/12/2015 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 301 | |
House | 02/12/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 301 | |
House | 12/09/2014 | Filed |