E | 06/15/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 06/15/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6048 | |
E | 05/25/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4774 | |
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2028 | |
House | 05/24/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4466 | |
House | 05/23/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4468 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4216 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1872 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1872 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1872 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1872 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1872 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1871 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1871 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1849 | |
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1499 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1499 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1396 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2811 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Record vote | RV#649 | Journal Page: 2581 |
House | 05/06/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2581 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2581 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2529 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2529 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1944 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/16/2015 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 335 | |
House | 02/16/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 335 | |
House | 12/15/2014 | Filed |