Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB511 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Moody, Alonzo (Senate Sponsor - Rodríguez) H.B. No. 511
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 22, 2015;
 April 27, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Criminal Justice; May 6, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 6, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the prosecution of certain offenses committed against a
 person in custody.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 39.04(e)(1), Penal Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (1)  "Correctional facility" means:
 (A)  any place described by Section 1.07(a)(14);
 [or]
 (B)  any place or facility designated for the
 detention of a person suspected of violating a provision of the
 Immigration and Nationality Act (8 U.S.C. Section 1101 et seq.); or
 (C)  a "secure correctional facility" or "secure
 detention facility" as defined by Section 51.02, Family Code.
 SECTION 2.  Section 8B(a), Article 18.20, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  In this section, "correctional facility" means:
 (1)  any place described by Section 1.07(a)(14), Penal
 Code; or
 (2)  a "secure correctional facility" or "secure
 detention facility" as defined by Section 51.02, Family Code [has
 the meaning assigned by Section 39.04(e), Penal Code].
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *