Senate | 05/04/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1296 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1296 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1096 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1945 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1848 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Record vote | RV#341 | Journal Page: 1851 |
House | 04/23/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1851 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1851 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1841 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1841 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1706 | |
House | 04/09/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/16/2015 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 335 | |
House | 02/16/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 335 | |
House | 12/15/2014 | Filed |