1 | 1 | | 84R2374 MTB-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Larson H.B. No. 529 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to the composition of the Texas Transportation Commission |
---|
8 | 8 | | and the selection of members of that commission. |
---|
9 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Section 201.051(a), Transportation Code, is |
---|
11 | 11 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
12 | 12 | | (a) The Texas Transportation Commission consists of three |
---|
13 | 13 | | [five] members elected statewide [appointed by the governor with |
---|
14 | 14 | | the advice and consent of the senate]. |
---|
15 | 15 | | SECTION 2. Section 201.052, Transportation Code, is amended |
---|
16 | 16 | | to read as follows: |
---|
17 | 17 | | Sec. 201.052. TERMS. Members of the commission serve |
---|
18 | 18 | | staggered six-year terms, with the term [terms] of [either] one |
---|
19 | 19 | | member [or two members] expiring February 1 of each odd-numbered |
---|
20 | 20 | | year. |
---|
21 | 21 | | SECTION 3. Section 201.053(a), Transportation Code, is |
---|
22 | 22 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
23 | 23 | | (a) The members of the commission shall elect from among |
---|
24 | 24 | | their membership [governor shall designate one commissioner as] the |
---|
25 | 25 | | chair of the commission, who shall serve as presiding officer of the |
---|
26 | 26 | | commission. |
---|
27 | 27 | | SECTION 4. Section 201.057(a), Transportation Code, is |
---|
28 | 28 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
29 | 29 | | (a) It is a ground for removal from the commission if a |
---|
30 | 30 | | commissioner: |
---|
31 | 31 | | (1) does not have at the time of taking office or |
---|
32 | 32 | | maintain during service on the commission the qualifications |
---|
33 | 33 | | required by Section 201.051; |
---|
34 | 34 | | (2) violates a prohibition provided by Section |
---|
35 | 35 | | 201.051; |
---|
36 | 36 | | (3) cannot discharge the commissioner's duties for a |
---|
37 | 37 | | substantial part of the term for which the commissioner is elected |
---|
38 | 38 | | or appointed because of illness or disability; or |
---|
39 | 39 | | (4) is absent from more than half of the regularly |
---|
40 | 40 | | scheduled commission meetings that the commissioner is eligible to |
---|
41 | 41 | | attend during a calendar year, unless the absence is excused by |
---|
42 | 42 | | majority vote of the commission. |
---|
43 | 43 | | SECTION 5. Sections 201.059(a) and (c), Transportation |
---|
44 | 44 | | Code, are amended to read as follows: |
---|
45 | 45 | | (a) To be eligible to take office as a member of the |
---|
46 | 46 | | commission, a person elected or appointed to the commission must |
---|
47 | 47 | | complete at least one course of a training program that complies |
---|
48 | 48 | | with this section. |
---|
49 | 49 | | (c) A person elected or appointed to the commission is |
---|
50 | 50 | | entitled to reimbursement for travel expenses incurred in attending |
---|
51 | 51 | | the training program, as provided by the General Appropriations Act |
---|
52 | 52 | | and as if the person were a member of the commission. |
---|
53 | 53 | | SECTION 6. Section 52.092(c), Election Code, is amended to |
---|
54 | 54 | | read as follows: |
---|
55 | 55 | | (c) Statewide offices of the state government shall be |
---|
56 | 56 | | listed in the following order: |
---|
57 | 57 | | (1) governor; |
---|
58 | 58 | | (2) lieutenant governor; |
---|
59 | 59 | | (3) attorney general; |
---|
60 | 60 | | (4) comptroller of public accounts; |
---|
61 | 61 | | (5) commissioner of the General Land Office; |
---|
62 | 62 | | (6) commissioner of agriculture; |
---|
63 | 63 | | (7) commissioner of transportation; |
---|
64 | 64 | | (8) railroad commissioner; |
---|
65 | 65 | | (9) [(8)] chief justice, supreme court; |
---|
66 | 66 | | (10) [(9)] justice, supreme court; |
---|
67 | 67 | | (11) [(10)] presiding judge, court of criminal |
---|
68 | 68 | | appeals; |
---|
69 | 69 | | (12) [(11)] judge, court of criminal appeals. |
---|
70 | 70 | | SECTION 7. Sections 201.051(b), (b-1), (c), and (i), |
---|
71 | 71 | | Transportation Code, are repealed. |
---|
72 | 72 | | SECTION 8. (a) The first members of the Texas |
---|
73 | 73 | | Transportation Commission elected under the changes in law made by |
---|
74 | 74 | | this Act shall be elected at the general election held in November |
---|
75 | 75 | | 2016 to serve for a term that begins February 1, 2017. The members |
---|
76 | 76 | | elected at that election shall draw lots to determine which |
---|
77 | 77 | | member's term expires February 1, 2019, which member's term expires |
---|
78 | 78 | | February 1, 2021, and which member's term expires February 1, 2023. |
---|
79 | 79 | | (b) Until the members of the Texas Transportation |
---|
80 | 80 | | Commission elected under this Act take office, the governor will |
---|
81 | 81 | | continue to appoint members to the Texas Transportation Commission |
---|
82 | 82 | | and those members shall, unless otherwise removed as provided by |
---|
83 | 83 | | law, continue in office under the prior law that governed the |
---|
84 | 84 | | composition of the Texas Transportation Commission, and that prior |
---|
85 | 85 | | law is continued in effect for that purpose. |
---|
86 | 86 | | SECTION 9. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|