LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB530
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB530
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB530
Compare Versions
HB530 Senate Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB530 House Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB530 Enrolled May 30, 2015
HB530 Comm Sub May 22, 2015
HB530 Engrossed May 11, 2015
HB530 Comm Sub April 28, 2015
HB530 Introduced December 16, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
HB530 Senate Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB530 House Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB530 Enrolled May 30, 2015
HB530 Comm Sub May 22, 2015
HB530 Engrossed May 11, 2015
HB530 Comm Sub April 28, 2015
HB530 Introduced December 16, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare