LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB554
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB554
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB554
Compare Versions
HB554 Senate Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB554 House Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB554 Enrolled May 28, 2015
HB554 Comm Sub May 21, 2015
HB554 Engrossed May 7, 2015
HB554 Comm Sub March 25, 2015
HB554 Introduced December 18, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
HB554 Senate Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB554 House Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB554 Enrolled May 28, 2015
HB554 Comm Sub May 21, 2015
HB554 Engrossed May 7, 2015
HB554 Comm Sub March 25, 2015
HB554 Introduced December 18, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare