Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB598 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Clardy (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 598
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 12, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 12, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a segment of State Highway 21 in
 Nacogdoches County as the Bob Luman Memorial Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.102 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.102.  BOB LUMAN MEMORIAL HIGHWAY. (a) The portion
 of State Highway 21 in Nacogdoches County between its intersection
 with County Road 511 and its intersection with Farm-to-Market Road
 95 is designated as the Bob Luman Memorial Highway. The designation
 is in addition to any other designation.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Bob Luman Memorial Highway and any other
 appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *