Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1742
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1742
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 809
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1582
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1542
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#215
|
Journal Page: 1541
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1541
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1541
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1526
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1526
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 1444
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 1444
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 857
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2015
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 398
|
House
|
02/19/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 398
|
House
|
01/06/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|