House
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5696
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5696
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3495
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3495
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3138
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3138
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3138
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5401
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5401
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5401
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4971
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2428
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2428
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2428
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2428
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2428
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2428
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2428
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2026
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1896
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1691
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1691
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1628
|
House
|
05/17/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3788
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3607
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1138
|
Journal Page: 3606
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3606
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3606
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3493
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3493
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Springer
|
Journal Page: 3492
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3492
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2111
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 419
|
House
|
02/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 419
|
House
|
01/06/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|