Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB615 Latest Draft

Bill / Engrossed Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            84R2675 LEH-D
 By: Clardy H.B. No. 615


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to authorizing the sale of certain real property held by
 the Health and Human Services Commission to the City of Rusk.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  AUTHORIZATION FOR SALE. (a) As soon as
 practicable, the asset management division of the General Land
 Office, on behalf of the Health and Human Services Commission,
 shall offer for sale to the City of Rusk the real property described
 by Section 3 of this Act.
 (b)  Sections 31.1571, 31.158, and 31.159, Natural Resources
 Code, do not apply to the sale of real property authorized by this
 Act.
 SECTION 2.  SPECIFIC TERMS. (a) Consideration for the sale
 authorized by Section 1 of this Act must be in an amount equal to the
 market value of the property as established by an independent
 appraisal obtained by the asset management division of the General
 Land Office.
 (b)  Proceeds from the sale of real property authorized by
 this Act shall be deposited to the Texas capital trust fund.
 SECTION 3.  PROPERTY DESCRIPTION. Property held by the
 Health and Human Services Commission is described as follows:
 BEING 32.59 acres of land lying in the DANIEL JOSLIN SURVEY,
 ABSTRACT NO. 461, Cherokee County, Texas and being a portion of that
 91.61 acre tract, partly lying in the JOSLIN and partly in the A. H.
 WHITE SURVEY, ABSTRACT NO. 931, Cherokee County, Texas, all of
 which is out of that certain 1929.79 acres described as several
 tracts in Corrected Resolution from State Board of Control to Rusk
 State Hospital, December 4, 1929, recorded in Volume 139, Page 426,
 Deed Records of Cherokee County, Texas, (hereinafter shown as
 volume/page, DR, OR for Official Records), SAID tract described as
 follows: Bearing base line is East line of tract described below:
 BEGINNING at a 3" round concrete monument found in the East line of
 Loop or Farm to Market 343 for the Southwest corner of said 91.61
 acre tract and Northwest corner of 6.80 acres, International Paper
 Realty Corporation to C. David Blake and Ruth Ann Blake, June 27,
 2002, 1553/70, OR;
 THENCE Northerly along the East line of Loop No. 343 as follows:
 North 02 deg. 01 min. 47 sec. West, crossing the old Texas
 State Railroad bed and in all, 339.18 feet to a concrete highway
 monument found for angle point;
 North 23 deg. 47 min. 15 sec. West, 107.99 feet to a concrete
 highway monument found for angle point;
 North 01 deg. 59 min. 04 sec. West, 199.33 feet to a concrete
 highway monument found for angle point;
 North 09 deg. 03 min. 27 sec. West, 158.54 feet to a concrete
 highway monument found for the beginning of a curve to the right;
 THENCE along a curve to the right having a delta of 13 deg. 02 min.
 25 sec., radius of 2784.79 feet, arc of 633.81 feet, long chord of
 North 04 deg. 28 min. 48 sec. East, 632.44 feet to a concrete
 highway monument found for end of curve;
 THENCE South 75 deg. 37 min. 47 sec. East, crossing said 91.61
 acres, 1023.48 feet to a brass cap in concrete stamped "1969-6"
 found for "ELL" corner of said 91.61 acres and Northwest corner of
 53.3543 acres in deed from Roger Schroeder to Michael McCollom,
 November 27, 2006, 1821/821, OR;
 THENCE South 02 deg. 51 min. 49 sec. East, along the West line of
 said 53.3543 acres, crossing the old Texas State Railroad bed,
 continuing in all 1325.24 feet to a brass cap in concrete stamped
 "1969-7" found for the lower Southeast corner of said 91.61 acre
 tract, Northeast corner of 12 acres, A. M. Mancuso and M. L. Mancuso
 to Zosimo M. Elevera and Myrna G. Elevera, November 18, 1996,
 1368/612, OR;
 THENCE North 81 deg. 26 min. 10 sec. West, at 734.59 feet pass a
 square concrete monument found for the Northwest corner of said 12
 acres and Northeast corner of the Blake 6.80 acres, found marked "X"
 face of 14" Pine, North 21 deg. West, 24.1 feet, 13: Pine, North 50
 deg. East, 19.58 feet, 8" Pine, North 73 deg. East, 25.7 feet, 7"
 Pine South 57 deg. East, 28.44 feet, continuing a total distance of
 1031.13 feet to the PLACE OF BEGINNING and containing within these
 calls 32.59 acres of land of which approximately 1.17 acres lies
 within the limits of the Texas State Railroad now owned by the City
 of Rusk, leaving a net acreage of 31.44 acres to be conveyed.
 SECTION 4.  EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015.