House | 05/06/2015 | 1 hr. notice-for reconsideration | Journal Page: 2651 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2612 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Record vote | RV#673 | Journal Page: 2611 |
House | 05/06/2015 | Failed to pass to engrossment | Journal Page: 2611 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Amendment tabled | 1-Canales | Journal Page: 2610 |
House | 05/06/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2610 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1945 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/19/2015 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 399 | |
House | 02/19/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 399 | |
House | 01/06/2015 | Filed |