Senate | 05/20/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 1575 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1575 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1508 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3267 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2971 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Record vote | RV#840 | Journal Page: 2971 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2971 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2971 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2916 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Record vote | RV#824 | Journal Page: 2916 |
House | 05/08/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2916 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2916 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Postponed | 5/8/15 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2752 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2752 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1945 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/19/2015 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 400 | |
House | 02/19/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 400 | |
House | 01/08/2015 | Filed |