Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB644 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Canales, Minjarez (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 644
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2015;
 May 14, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the contents of a search warrant and to the offense of
 tampering with a governmental record consisting of a search
 warrant.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 18.04, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Art. 18.04.  CONTENTS OF WARRANT. A search warrant issued
 under this chapter shall be sufficient if it contains the following
 requisites:
 (1)  that it run in the name of "The State of Texas";
 (2)  that it identify, as near as may be, that which is
 to be seized and name or describe, as near as may be, the person,
 place, or thing to be searched;
 (3)  that it command any peace officer of the proper
 county to search forthwith the person, place, or thing named; [and]
 (4)  that it be dated and signed by the magistrate; and
 (5)  that the magistrate's name appear in clearly
 legible handwriting or in typewritten form with the magistrate's
 signature.
 SECTION 2.  Article 18.021(c), Code of Criminal Procedure,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (c)  In addition to the requirements of Subdivisions (1),
 (4), and (5) [and (4)] of Article 18.04 of this code, a warrant
 issued under this article shall identify, as near as may be, the
 child to be located and photographed, shall name or describe, as
 near as may be, the place or thing to be searched, and shall command
 any peace officer of the proper county to search for and cause the
 child to be photographed.
 SECTION 3.  Section 37.10(c)(2), Penal Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (2)  An offense under this section is a felony of the
 third degree if it is shown on the trial of the offense that the
 governmental record was:
 (A)  a public school record, report, or assessment
 instrument required under Chapter 39, Education Code, data reported
 for a school district or open-enrollment charter school to the
 Texas Education Agency through the Public Education Information
 Management System (PEIMS) described by Section 42.006, Education
 Code, under a law or rule requiring that reporting, or a license,
 certificate, permit, seal, title, letter of patent, or similar
 document issued by government, by another state, or by the United
 States, unless the actor's intent is to defraud or harm another, in
 which event the offense is a felony of the second degree;
 (B)  a written report of a medical, chemical,
 toxicological, ballistic, or other expert examination or test
 performed on physical evidence for the purpose of determining the
 connection or relevance of the evidence to a criminal action; [or]
 (C)  a written report of the certification,
 inspection, or maintenance record of an instrument, apparatus,
 implement, machine, or other similar device used in the course of an
 examination or test performed on physical evidence for the purpose
 of determining the connection or relevance of the evidence to a
 criminal action; or
 (D)  a search warrant issued by a magistrate.
 SECTION 4.  (a) The changes in law made by this Act in
 amending Articles 18.04 and 18.021(c), Code of Criminal Procedure,
 apply to a search warrant issued on or after the effective date of
 this Act. A search warrant issued before the effective date of this
 Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the warrant was
 issued, and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 (b)  The change in law made by this Act in adding Section
 37.10(c)(2)(D), Penal Code, applies only to an offense committed on
 or after the effective date of this Act. An offense committed
 before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in
 effect on the date the offense was committed, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose. For purposes of this
 subsection, an offense was committed before the effective date of
 this Act if any element of the offense occurred before that date.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *