Senate | 05/20/2015 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 1742 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1742 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1252 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2343 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2155 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Record vote | RV#451 | Journal Page: 2154 |
House | 04/30/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2154 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2154 | |
House | 04/29/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2087 | |
House | 04/29/2015 | Record vote | RV#443 | Journal Page: 2086 |
House | 04/29/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2086 | |
House | 04/29/2015 | Amended | 1-K. King | Journal Page: 2086 |
House | 04/29/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2086 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Postponed | 4/29/15 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 1911 |
House | 04/23/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1910 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/10/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/10/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/09/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 617 | |
House | 03/03/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/03/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/03/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/24/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 02/24/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 02/24/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 02/24/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/24/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/09/2015 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 243 | |
House | 02/09/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 243 | |
House | 11/10/2014 | Filed |