Senate | 04/27/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1122 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1122 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1032 | |
House | 04/21/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1830 | |
House | 04/21/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1757 | |
House | 04/21/2015 | Record vote | RV#300 | Journal Page: 1757 |
House | 04/21/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1757 | |
House | 04/21/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1757 | |
House | 04/20/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1720 | |
House | 04/20/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1720 | |
House | 04/20/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1581 | |
House | 04/06/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/19/2015 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 402 | |
House | 02/19/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 402 | |
House | 01/13/2015 | Filed |