Senate | 05/18/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1672 | |
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1672 | |
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1628 | |
House | 05/17/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3788 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3591 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Record vote | RV#1124 | Journal Page: 3591 |
House | 05/15/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 3591 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Amendment withdrawn | 1-Gutierrez | Journal Page: 3590 |
House | 05/15/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3590 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3455 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Record vote | RV#1085 | Journal Page: 3454 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3454 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Amended | 3-Gutierrez | Journal Page: 3454 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Amendment withdrawn | 1-Moody | Journal Page: 3454 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3453 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1945 | |
House | 04/20/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/03/2015 | Referred to Pensions | Journal Page: 515 | |
House | 03/03/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 515 | |
House | 01/13/2015 | Filed |