Senate | 05/21/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 1432 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1432 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1253 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2560 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2290 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Record vote | RV#506 | Journal Page: 2289 |
House | 05/01/2015 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 2289 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Amended | 1-Murr | Journal Page: 2289 |
House | 05/01/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2289 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2229 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Record vote | RV#480 | Journal Page: 2229 |
House | 04/30/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2229 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Amended | 1-Burrows and Springer | Journal Page: 2228 |
House | 04/30/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2228 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1829 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/19/2015 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 403 | |
House | 02/19/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 403 | |
House | 01/13/2015 | Filed |