Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB69 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 11/10/2014

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            84R1314 ADM-F
 By: McClendon H.B. No. 69


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of the Juvenile Court Jurisdiction Task
 Force.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  JUVENILE COURT JURISDICTION TASK FORCE. (a)  In
 this Act:
 (1)  "Juvenile" means a person subject to the
 jurisdiction of a juvenile court for acts committed when the person
 was a child.
 (2)  "Task force" means the Juvenile Court Jurisdiction
 Task Force established under this section.
 (b)  The Juvenile Court Jurisdiction Task Force is
 established. The purpose of the task force is to:
 (1)  evaluate a proposal to define a person who is 17
 years of age and commits an offense as a child under the Family Code
 to include the person under the jurisdiction of a juvenile court;
 and
 (2)  if the task force determines the legislature
 should implement the proposal, develop an implementation plan that
 includes legislative, administrative, and funding changes
 necessary to implement the proposal.
 (c)  The task force is composed of the following 25 members:
 (1)  the chief justice of the supreme court or the chief
 justice's designee;
 (2)  the presiding judge of the court of criminal
 appeals or the presiding judge's designee;
 (3)  the executive director of the Texas Department of
 Criminal Justice or the executive director's designee;
 (4)  the executive director of the Texas Juvenile
 Justice Department or the executive director's designee;
 (5)  the executive director of the Commission on Jail
 Standards or the executive director's designee;
 (6)  the public safety director of the Department of
 Public Safety or the director's designee;
 (7)  the independent ombudsman of the Texas Juvenile
 Justice Department or the independent ombudsman's designee;
 (8)  one representative of the Legislative Budget Board
 with expertise in criminal justice population projections and
 budget issues, appointed by the director of the Legislative Budget
 Board;
 (9)  one prosecutor with expertise in prosecuting
 juvenile offenders, appointed by the governor;
 (10)  one criminal defense lawyer, appointed by the
 governor;
 (11)  one current or former juvenile court judge,
 appointed by the chief justice of the supreme court;
 (12)  one current or former criminal court judge
 appointed by the presiding judge of the court of criminal appeals;
 (13)  one school administrator, appointed by the
 governor;
 (14)  one chief juvenile probation officer from an
 urban county and one chief juvenile probation officer from a rural
 county, appointed by the governor;
 (15)  one chief adult probation officer, appointed by
 the governor;
 (16)  one police chief, appointed by the governor;
 (17)  one person with expertise in brain development or
 adolescent mental health, appointed by the governor;
 (18)  one person who was adjudicated for a juvenile
 offense in Texas, appointed by the governor;
 (19)  three members of the house of representatives,
 appointed by the speaker of the house; and
 (20)  three members of the senate, appointed by the
 lieutenant governor.
 (d)  The governor shall designate a member of the task force
 to serve as presiding officer.
 (e)  The presiding officer may designate additional experts
 to serve as advisors to the task force.
 (f)  A person designated to make an appointment of a member
 of the task force shall make the appointment not later than the 60th
 day after the effective date of this Act.  The designated person
 shall fill a vacancy in the task force or a vacancy in the position
 of presiding officer of the task force by the appointment of another
 person with the same qualifications as the original appointee.
 (g)  The presiding officer shall call the initial meeting of
 the task force on or before December 1, 2015. The task force shall
 meet at the times and places that the presiding officer determines
 are appropriate. The task force shall adopt rules necessary to
 fulfill the task force's duties under this Act.
 (h)  A member of the task force is not entitled to
 compensation but may be entitled to reimbursement for the member's
 actual and necessary expenses incurred in attending meetings of the
 task force and performing other official duties authorized by the
 presiding officer of the task force, if funding is available.
 (i)  The task force may request meeting facilities, data,
 clerical help, or other assistance from any department, agency,
 institution, office, or political subdivision of this state.
 (j)  State funds may not be appropriated for purposes of the
 task force. The task force may apply for, receive, and accept
 grants of funds or other contributions as appropriate to assist in
 the performance of its duties. The task force may contract for
 consultants or technical assistance.
 (k)  The task force is not subject to Chapter 2110,
 Government Code.
 SECTION 2.  DUTIES OF TASK FORCE. (a)  After evaluating the
 proposal described by Section 1(b) of this Act, the task force shall
 determine whether the legislature should implement that proposal.
 To make the determination, the task force shall consider:
 (1)  the potential short-term and long-term benefits to
 offenders, victims, and taxpayers;
 (2)  the requirements of federal law, including the
 Prison Rape Elimination Act of 2003 (42 U.S.C. Section 15601 et
 seq.), for the confinement of persons 17 years of age;
 (3)  the implications of the decisions of the United
 States Supreme Court in Miller v. Alabama, 567 U.S. ____ (2012), and
 similar cases involving the sentencing of persons younger than 18
 years of age;
 (4)  appropriate sanctions, services, and treatment
 programs for persons 17 years of age who have committed criminal
 offenses and the effectiveness of the sanctions, services, and
 programs;
 (5)  best practices and national trends in the
 prosecution and sentencing of persons younger than 18 years of age;
 (6)  data about the nature and frequency of offenses
 committed by persons 17 years of age in this state;
 (7)  the projected costs and savings for the state
 criminal court and juvenile court systems, state and local law
 enforcement, local adult and juvenile probation departments, state
 and local correctional facilities, and facilities operated by the
 Texas Juvenile Justice Department;
 (8)  which criminal and juvenile justice laws to amend,
 including laws relating to traffic offenses, offenses under the
 Education Code or Alcoholic Beverage Code, and laws relating to
 criminal records; and
 (9)  any other issues that the task force considers
 relevant to the proposal.
 (b)  The task force shall:
 (1)  develop the implementation plan relating to the
 proposal described by Section 1(b) of this Act;
 (2)  calculate the projected state and local adult and
 juvenile correctional facility populations if the plan is
 implemented;
 (3)  conduct a cost-benefit analysis for each part of
 the juvenile and adult criminal justice systems and for offenders,
 victims, and taxpayers if the plan is implemented; and
 (4)  make findings and recommendations and describe
 policy considerations relating to whether the proposal should be
 adopted.
 SECTION 3.  REPORT. Not later than December 1, 2016, the
 task force shall deliver an interim report of the task force's
 findings and recommendations, including legislative,
 administrative, and funding recommendations, to the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives,
 the standing committees of each house of the legislature with
 primary jurisdiction over criminal justice and juvenile justice
 matters, the supreme court, the court of criminal appeals, the
 executive director of the Texas Department of Criminal Justice, and
 the executive director of the Texas Juvenile Justice Department.
 SECTION 4.  FINAL REPORT. The task force shall deliver a
 final report not later than December 1, 2018, to the persons listed
 in Section 3 of this Act describing the results of the
 implementation of the laws enacted by the 85th Legislature relating
 to the task force's recommendations and providing additional
 legislative, administrative, or funding recommendations to make
 the change in law more effective.
 SECTION 5.  EXPIRATION. The task force is abolished and this
 Act expires August 31, 2019.
 SECTION 6.  EFFECTIVE DATE.  This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution.  If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015.