Senate | 04/28/2015 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1157 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1157 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1096 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1945 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1849 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1848 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Record vote | RV#341 | Journal Page: 1849 |
House | 04/23/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1849 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1849 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1836 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1836 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 03/29/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/27/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1063 | |
House | 03/24/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2015 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 420 | |
House | 02/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 420 | |
House | 01/14/2015 | Filed |