House | 05/08/2015 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2915 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1791 | Journal Page: 2915 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Postponed | 5/8/15 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2726 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2725 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Postponed | 5/7/15 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2537 |
House | 05/05/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2537 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1551 | |
House | 04/09/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2015 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 420 | |
House | 02/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 420 | |
House | 01/14/2015 | Filed |