Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB705 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Farrar (Senate Sponsor - Ellis) H.B. No. 705
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 April 23, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 6, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 6, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 HuffmanX
 EllisX
 BirdwellX
 CreightonX
 EstesX
 FraserX
 NelsonX
 SchwertnerX
 ZaffiriniX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to access to a financial institution account of a person
 who dies intestate.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle D, Title 2, Estates Code, is amended by
 adding Chapter 153 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 153. ACCESS TO INTESTATE'S ACCOUNT WITH FINANCIAL
 INSTITUTION
 Sec. 153.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Account" has the meaning assigned by Section
 113.001.
 (2)  "Financial institution" has the meaning assigned
 by Section 201.101, Finance Code.
 (3)  "P.O.D. account" and "trust account" have the
 meanings assigned by Section 113.004.
 Sec. 153.002.  INAPPLICABILITY OF CHAPTER. This chapter
 does not apply to:
 (1)  an account with a beneficiary designation;
 (2)  a P.O.D. account;
 (3)  a trust account; or
 (4)  an account that provides for a right of
 survivorship.
 Sec. 153.003.  COURT-ORDERED ACCESS TO INTESTATE'S ACCOUNT
 INFORMATION. (a) In this section, "interested person" means an
 heir, spouse, creditor, or any other having a property right in or
 claim against the decedent's estate.
 (b)  On application of an interested person or on the court's
 own motion, a court may issue an order requiring a financial
 institution to release to the person named in the order information
 concerning the balance of each account that is maintained at the
 financial institution of a decedent who dies intestate if:
 (1)  90 days have elapsed since the date of the
 decedent's death;
 (2)  no petition for the appointment of a personal
 representative for the decedent's estate is pending; and
 (3)  no letters testamentary or of administration have
 been granted with respect to the estate.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *