E | 06/17/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 06/17/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6048 | |
E | 05/29/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5697 | |
Senate | 05/29/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3106 | |
House | 05/28/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5207 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5212 | |
House | 05/26/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4764 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2320 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2320 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2320 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2320 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2320 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2320 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2320 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 2024 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1850 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1842 | |
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1672 | |
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1672 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1459 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2966 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2691 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Record vote | RV#695 | Journal Page: 2691 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2691 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2691 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2624 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Amended | 1-S. Turner | Journal Page: 2623 |
House | 05/06/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2623 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1550 | |
House | 04/09/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2015 | Referred to Corrections | Journal Page: 421 | |
House | 02/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 421 | |
House | 01/14/2015 | Filed |