Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB721 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Farias, Minjarez (Senate Sponsor - Campbell) H.B. No. 721
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2015;
 May 6, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs and Military Installations; May 15, 2015, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 15, 2015, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the hunting or fishing license fee waiver for certain
 disabled veterans.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 42.012(c), Parks and Wildlife Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  "Qualified disabled veteran" means a veteran with a
 service connected disability, as defined by the United States
 Department of Veterans Affairs [Veterans' Administration],
 consisting of the loss of the use of a lower extremity or of a
 disability rating of 50 [60] percent or more and who is receiving
 compensation from the United States for the disability.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *