House
|
04/30/2015
|
Laid on the table subject to call
|
|
Journal Page: 2117
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Companion considered in lieu of
|
SB 415
|
Journal Page: 2117
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1472
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in s/c
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2015
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 422
|
House
|
02/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 422
|
House
|
01/15/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|