Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB735 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2015

                    By: Israel (Senate Sponsor - Ellis) H.B. No. 735
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2015;
 May 11, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 19, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the collection of information regarding the number of
 alternatively fueled vehicles registered in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 502, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 502.004 to read as follows:
 Sec. 502.004.  INFORMATION ON ALTERNATIVELY FUELED
 VEHICLES. (a) In this section, "alternatively fueled vehicle"
 means a motor vehicle that is capable of using a fuel other than
 gasoline or diesel fuel.
 (b)  The department by rule shall establish a program to
 collect information about the number of alternatively fueled
 vehicles registered in this state.
 (c)  The department shall submit an annual report to the
 legislature that includes the information collected under this
 section. The report must, at a minimum, show the number of vehicles
 registered in this state that use:
 (1)  electric plug-in drives;
 (2)  hybrid electric drives;
 (3)  compressed natural gas drives; and
 (4)  liquefied natural gas drives.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2016.
 * * * * *