LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB751
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB751
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB751
Compare Versions
HB751 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB751 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB751 Enrolled May 30, 2015
HB751 Comm Sub April 30, 2015
HB751 Engrossed April 14, 2015
HB751 Comm Sub March 31, 2015
HB751 Introduced January 15, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
HB751 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB751 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB751 Enrolled May 30, 2015
HB751 Comm Sub April 30, 2015
HB751 Engrossed April 14, 2015
HB751 Comm Sub March 31, 2015
HB751 Introduced January 15, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare