E
|
06/09/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/09/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6048
|
E
|
05/26/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4984
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2290
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4570
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4575
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4340
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1950
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1950
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1950
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1950
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1950
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1950
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1950
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1786
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1500
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1500
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1343
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2676
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#618
|
Journal Page: 2509
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2509
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2509
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2442
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Laubenberg
|
Journal Page: 2442
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2442
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2004
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2015
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 459
|
House
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 459
|
House
|
01/16/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|