Senate | 05/21/2015 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 1845 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 1784 | |
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 1007 | |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1007 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 809 | |
House | 04/14/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1582 | |
House | 04/14/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1538 | |
House | 04/14/2015 | Record vote | RV#211 | Journal Page: 1537 |
House | 04/14/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1537 | |
House | 04/14/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1537 | |
House | 04/13/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1523 | |
House | 04/13/2015 | Record vote | RV#203 | Journal Page: 1522 |
House | 04/13/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1522 | |
House | 04/13/2015 | Amended | 2-Smith | Journal Page: 1522 |
House | 04/13/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1522 | |
House | 04/13/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1375 | |
House | 03/24/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2015 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 425 | |
House | 02/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 425 | |
House | 01/16/2015 | Filed |