LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB77
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB77
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB77
Compare Versions
HB77 Senate Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB77 Engrossed February 1, 2025
HB77 House Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB77 Enrolled May 30, 2015
HB77 Comm Sub May 22, 2015
HB77 Comm Sub March 3, 2015
HB77 Introduced November 10, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
HB77 Senate Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB77 Engrossed February 1, 2025
HB77 House Committee Report February 1, 2025
HB77 Enrolled May 30, 2015
HB77 Comm Sub May 22, 2015
HB77 Comm Sub March 3, 2015
HB77 Introduced November 10, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare