Senate | 05/22/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1945 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations | Journal Page: 1388 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1388 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1309 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2560 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Record vote | RV#562 | Journal Page: 2386 |
House | 05/04/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2386 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2386 | |
House | 05/02/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2324 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2324 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Record vote | RV#490 | Journal Page: 2245 |
House | 04/30/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2245 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1471 | |
House | 04/01/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2015 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 426 | |
House | 02/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 426 | |
House | 01/16/2015 | Filed |