E
|
05/29/2015
|
Effective on 1/1/16
|
|
|
E
|
05/29/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5697
|
E
|
05/20/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4088
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1741
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3898
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1681
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3909
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3769
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3770
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1189
|
Journal Page: 3769
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3769
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3545
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1597
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1597
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1597
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1597
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1597
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1596
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1596
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1546
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1297
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1297
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1004
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1784
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#284
|
Journal Page: 1717
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1717
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1717
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1645
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1645
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1471
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2015
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 426
|
House
|
02/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 426
|
House
|
01/20/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|