By: Burkett, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 790 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 18, 2015; May 18, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to a study on the implementation and effectiveness of sound mitigation measures on certain highways. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. (a) The Texas A&M Transportation Institute shall conduct a study assessing the implementation and effectiveness of sound mitigation measures on highways that are part of the state highway system and toll roads or turnpikes under the jurisdiction of a toll project entity as defined by Section 372.001, Transportation Code. The study must include: (1) an analysis of the process and methodology used by the Texas Department of Transportation or toll project entity for selecting and implementing sound mitigation measures, including factors that affect the process and how outcomes are determined; (2) an analysis of whether any kind of live testing is conducted at any point to determine the actual traffic noise level for neighboring properties; (3) an evaluation of the effectiveness of the process and methodology described by Subdivision (1) of this subsection in reducing the traffic noise level for neighboring properties; and (4) an evaluation of the effectiveness of implemented sound mitigation measures in reducing the traffic noise level for neighboring properties. (b) Not later than November 1, 2016, the Texas A&M Transportation Institute shall submit a report on the results of the study and any recommendations to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and the presiding officer of each standing committee of the legislature with jurisdiction over transportation matters. (c) This Act expires August 31, 2017. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015. * * * * *