1 | | - | By: Burkett, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 790 |
---|
2 | | - | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 18, 2015; |
---|
3 | | - | May 18, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
4 | | - | Transportation; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following |
---|
5 | | - | vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | | - | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 1 | + | H.B. No. 790 |
---|
10 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 5 | | relating to a study on the implementation and effectiveness of |
---|
12 | 6 | | sound mitigation measures on certain highways. |
---|
13 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 8 | | SECTION 1. (a) The Texas A&M Transportation Institute |
---|
15 | 9 | | shall conduct a study assessing the implementation and |
---|
16 | 10 | | effectiveness of sound mitigation measures on highways that are |
---|
17 | 11 | | part of the state highway system and toll roads or turnpikes under |
---|
18 | 12 | | the jurisdiction of a toll project entity as defined by Section |
---|
19 | 13 | | 372.001, Transportation Code. The study must include: |
---|
20 | 14 | | (1) an analysis of the process and methodology used by |
---|
21 | 15 | | the Texas Department of Transportation or toll project entity for |
---|
22 | 16 | | selecting and implementing sound mitigation measures, including |
---|
23 | 17 | | factors that affect the process and how outcomes are determined; |
---|
24 | 18 | | (2) an analysis of whether any kind of live testing is |
---|
25 | 19 | | conducted at any point to determine the actual traffic noise level |
---|
26 | 20 | | for neighboring properties; |
---|
27 | 21 | | (3) an evaluation of the effectiveness of the process |
---|
28 | 22 | | and methodology described by Subdivision (1) of this subsection in |
---|
29 | 23 | | reducing the traffic noise level for neighboring properties; and |
---|
30 | 24 | | (4) an evaluation of the effectiveness of implemented |
---|
31 | 25 | | sound mitigation measures in reducing the traffic noise level for |
---|
32 | 26 | | neighboring properties. |
---|
33 | 27 | | (b) Not later than November 1, 2016, the Texas A&M |
---|
34 | 28 | | Transportation Institute shall submit a report on the results of |
---|
35 | 29 | | the study and any recommendations to the governor, the lieutenant |
---|
36 | 30 | | governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and the |
---|
37 | 31 | | presiding officer of each standing committee of the legislature |
---|
38 | 32 | | with jurisdiction over transportation matters. |
---|
39 | 33 | | (c) This Act expires August 31, 2017. |
---|
40 | 34 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
41 | 35 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
42 | 36 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
43 | 37 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
44 | 38 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|
45 | | - | * * * * * |
---|
| 39 | + | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
| 40 | + | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
| 41 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 790 was passed by the House on May 15, |
---|
| 42 | + | 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 133, Nays 6, 2 present, not |
---|
| 43 | + | voting. |
---|
| 44 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 45 | + | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
| 46 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 790 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
| 47 | + | 26, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1. |
---|
| 48 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 49 | + | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
| 50 | + | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
| 51 | + | Date |
---|
| 52 | + | _____________________ |
---|
| 53 | + | Governor |
---|