E
|
06/16/2015
|
Effective on 1/1/16
|
|
|
E
|
06/16/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6048
|
E
|
05/25/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4774
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2028
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4335
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4344
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3996
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1273
|
Journal Page: 3997
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3996
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3901
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1727
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1727
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1727
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1727
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1727
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1727
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1727
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1546
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1297
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1297
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 957
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1707
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#233
|
Journal Page: 1599
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1599
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1599
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1590
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1590
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1375
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2015
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 426
|
House
|
02/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 426
|
House
|
01/20/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|