Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB792 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Clardy (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 792
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 12, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 12, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 792 By:  Nichols


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 NicholsX
 HuffinesX
 EllisX
 FraserX
 GarciaX
 HallX
 HancockX
 KolkhorstX
 TaylorofCollinX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of specialty license plates for antique
 buses.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 504.502(a) and (b), Transportation
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The department shall issue specialty license plates for
 a passenger car, truck, motorcycle, bus, or former military vehicle
 that:
 (1)  is at least 25 years old, if the vehicle is a
 passenger car, truck, [or] motorcycle, or bus;
 (2)  is a collector's item;
 (3)  is used exclusively for exhibitions, club
 activities, parades, and other functions of public interest and is
 not used for regular transportation; and
 (4)  does not carry advertising.
 (b)  The license plates must include the words "Antique
 Auto," "Antique Truck," "Antique Motorcycle," "Antique Bus," or
 "Military Vehicle," as appropriate.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2016.
 * * * * *