Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1543
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1546
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1503
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1436
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1339
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1007
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1007
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 618
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1063
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#95
|
Journal Page: 1038
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1038
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1038
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1023
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1023
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#91
|
Journal Page: 1022
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1022
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Amendment tabled
|
14-Dutton
|
Journal Page: 1016
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
13-Dutton
|
Journal Page: 1016
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 1016
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Amended
|
10-Smithee
|
Journal Page: 1010
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 994
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 760
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2015
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 244
|
House
|
02/09/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 244
|
House
|
11/10/2014
|
Filed
|
|
|