Senate | 05/19/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 1297 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1297 | |
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1060 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1945 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1797 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Record vote | RV#323 | Journal Page: 1796 |
House | 04/22/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1796 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1796 | |
House | 04/21/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1772 | |
House | 04/21/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1772 | |
House | 04/21/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/10/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1530 | |
House | 04/02/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/10/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/10/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/10/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/10/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2015 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 427 | |
House | 02/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 427 | |
House | 01/20/2015 | Filed |