Senate | 05/13/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1575 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1575 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1459 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2966 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2714 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Record vote | RV#718 | Journal Page: 2713 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2713 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2713 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2644 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Amended | 1-Phillips | Journal Page: 2644 |
House | 05/06/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2644 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1472 | |
House | 04/02/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 428 | |
House | 02/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 428 | |
House | 01/21/2015 | Filed |