E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3626
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6045
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6046
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3618
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1803
|
Journal Page: 5859
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5858
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6023
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3596
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3565
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5570
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5570
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3344
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3344
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3138
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3138
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3138
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5381
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5381
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5381
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4979
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2416
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2416
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2416
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2416
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2416
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2415
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2415
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 L. Taylor
|
Journal Page: 2415
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2415
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2415
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1340
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1157
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1157
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1097
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1848
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#341
|
Journal Page: 1849
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1849
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1849
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1836
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1836
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1366
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2015
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 429
|
House
|
02/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 429
|
House
|
01/21/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|