H.B. No. 824 AN ACT relating to the sale of alcoholic beverages to customers of a package store during certain hours. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Chapter 22, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is amended by adding Section 22.17 to read as follows: Sec. 22.17. SALE TO CUSTOMER IN STORE AT CLOSING. Notwithstanding any other provision of this code, if a customer has entered a package store during hours in which the package store may sell alcohol and is still in the store at the time the hours of legal sale end, the permittee may allow the customer to remain in the store for a reasonable amount of time to finish shopping, and the permittee may sell an alcoholic beverage to that customer even though the sale occurs after the designated end of the hours of legal sale. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 824 was passed by the House on April 23, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 139, Nays 0, 2 present, not voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 824 on May 29, 2015, and requested the appointment of a conference committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. 824 on May 31, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 824 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 27, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 28, Nays 3; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. 824 on May 31, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 28, Nays 3. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor