Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB826 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Giddings (Senate Sponsor - Ellis) H.B. No. 826
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 April 30, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 12, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 12, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the provision of information relating to the
 modification of a child support order in certain suits affecting
 the parent-child relationship.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 105.006, Family Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (e-2) to read as follows:
 (e-2)  An order in a suit that orders child support must
 contain the following prominently displayed statement in boldfaced
 type, in capital letters, or underlined:
 "THE COURT MAY MODIFY THIS ORDER THAT PROVIDES FOR THE
 SUPPORT OF A CHILD, IF:
 (1)  THE CIRCUMSTANCES OF THE CHILD OR A PERSON
 AFFECTED BY THE ORDER HAVE MATERIALLY AND SUBSTANTIALLY CHANGED; OR
 (2)  IT HAS BEEN THREE YEARS SINCE THE ORDER WAS
 RENDERED OR LAST MODIFIED AND THE MONTHLY AMOUNT OF THE CHILD
 SUPPORT AWARD UNDER THE ORDER DIFFERS BY EITHER 20 PERCENT OR $100
 FROM THE AMOUNT THAT WOULD BE AWARDED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CHILD
 SUPPORT GUIDELINES."
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies to a
 suit affecting the parent-child relationship pending in a trial
 court on or filed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *